TN SB1588 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes any person licensed as an amateur radio operator eligible to purchase an amateur radio special license plate, rather than allowing only certain persons to purchase such plates. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, makes any person licensed as an amateur radio operator eligible to purchase an amateur radio special license plate, rather than allowing only certain persons to purchase such plates. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 990 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1558 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 990