TN HB1554 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies additional circumstances under which the commissioner of revenue may waive penalties for delinquent franchise and excise taxes; alters the formula for calculating quarterly estimated payments for franchise and excise taxes; reduces penalties for deficient or delinquent estimated franchise and excise tax payments from 5 percent to 2 percent per month; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, specifies additional circumstances under which the commissioner of revenue may waive penalties for delinquent franchise and excise taxes; alters the formula for calculating quarterly estimated payments for franchise and excise taxes; reduces penalties for deficient or delinquent estimated franchise and excise tax payments from 5 percent to 2 percent per month; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 881 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1010) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0874) |
2016-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2558 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 881