TN HB1552 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes motor vehicle commission to take licensure action against a dealer who finances the sale of used motor vehicles and retains titles to such vehicles and who fails to maintain record of customer's liability coverage or proof of financial responsibility whenever temporary plate issued to customer; requires record to be maintained in same manner or period of time as record of issuance of temporary plates. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes motor vehicle commission to take licensure action against a dealer who finances the sale of used motor vehicles and retains titles to such vehicles and who fails to maintain record of customer's liability coverage or proof of financial responsibility whenever temporary plate issued to customer; requires record to be maintained in same manner or period of time as record of issuance of temporary plates. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 668 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2018; 01/01/2019 | |
2018-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0831) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0677) |
2018-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1607 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 668