TN SB1607 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes motor vehicle commission to take licensure action against a dealer who finances the sale of used motor vehicles and retains titles to such vehicles and who fails to maintain record of customer's liability coverage or proof of financial responsibility whenever temporary plate issued to customer; requires record to be maintained in same manner or period of time as record of issuance of temporary plates. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes motor vehicle commission to take licensure action against a dealer who finances the sale of used motor vehicles and retains titles to such vehicles and who fails to maintain record of customer's liability coverage or proof of financial responsibility whenever temporary plate issued to customer; requires record to be maintained in same manner or period of time as record of issuance of temporary plates. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 668 | |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1552 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 668