TN HB1543 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates September 14 of each year as "Star-Spangled Banner Day," a day of special observance. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, Chapter 2, relative to Star-Spangled Banner Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 167 | |
2021-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming & Designating |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0316 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021