TN HB1522 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pr. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pr. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the salaries of mayor and aldermen to be set by ordinance; reduces, from three to two, the number of readings required for adoption of ordinances; deletes position of commissioners as heads of city departments; deletes provisions regarding bail and fines and costs; removes provision authorizing the re-appropriation of funds between departments. - Amends Chapter 87 of the Private Acts of 1981; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes the salaries of mayor and aldermen to be set by ordinance; reduces, from three to two, the number of readings required for adoption of ordinances; deletes position of commissioners as heads of city departments; deletes provisions regarding bail and fines and costs; removes provision authorizing the re-appropriation of funds between departments. - Amends Chapter 87 of the Private Acts of 1981; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pr. Ch. 9 | |
2019-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0293) |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1529 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 9