TN HB1498 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 607
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 607
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts certain religious organizations and religious institutions that provide limited respite care services programs from licensure for providing adult day care. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As enacted, exempts certain religious organizations and religious institutions that provide limited respite care services programs from licensure for providing adult day care. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] |
Rep. Beth Harwell [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] |
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 607 | |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1487 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 607