TN HB1497 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a "5th Special Forces Group (Airborne)" military license plate for issuance to current or former members of the unit and spouses or children of such members. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a "5th Special Forces Group (Airborne)" military license plate for issuance to current or former members of the unit and spouses or children of such members. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926
2018-04-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-23HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018
2018-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2018-01-11HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2018-01-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1474 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 926

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback