TN SB1474 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 926
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a "5th Special Forces Group (Airborne)" military license plate for issuance to current or former members of the unit and spouses or children of such members. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a "5th Special Forces Group (Airborne)" military license plate for issuance to current or former members of the unit and spouses or children of such members. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Pub. Ch. 926
2018-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-05-15SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-23HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
2018-04-23HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0864)
2018-04-23HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-02-26HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-02-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-02-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2018-02-22SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0597)
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2018
2018-02-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/14/2018
2018-01-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/7/2018
2018-01-17SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 1/24/2018
2018-01-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-10-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1497 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback