TN HB1481 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, disqualifies any county employee from serving as a member of the county legislative body; exempts current members of the county legislative body; disqualifies any city employee from serving as a member of the governing body of the city; exempts current members of the governing body of the city. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Title
As introduced, disqualifies any county employee from serving as a member of the county legislative body; exempts current members of the county legislative body; disqualifies any city employee from serving as a member of the governing body of the city; exempts current members of the governing body of the city. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1513 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.