TN SB1513 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, disqualifies any county employee from serving as a member of the county legislative body; exempts current members of the county legislative body; disqualifies any city employee from serving as a member of the governing body of the city; exempts current members of the governing body of the city. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Title
As introduced, disqualifies any county employee from serving as a member of the county legislative body; exempts current members of the county legislative body; disqualifies any city employee from serving as a member of the governing body of the city; exempts current members of the governing body of the city. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 24, Nays 4, PNV 2 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0953) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1109) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1481 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee