TN HB1480 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reconsidered. Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reconsidered. Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from five days to one business day, the timeframe by which the department of human services must send notice of an administrative order of seizure or sale of assets to the child support obligor. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, changes from five days to one business day, the timeframe by which the department of human services must send notice of an administrative order of seizure or sale of assets to the child support obligor. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Reconsidered. Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reassigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1317 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee