TN HB1475 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a sales and use tax exemption on purchases made by any veteran with a 100 percent permanent total disability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a sales and use tax exemption on purchases made by any veteran with a 100 percent permanent total disability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Watson [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1775 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1475&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1475.pdf |