TN SB1775 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a sales and use tax exemption on purchases made by any veteran with a 100 percent permanent total disability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a sales and use tax exemption on purchases made by any veteran with a 100 percent permanent total disability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Eric Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1475 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1775&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1775.pdf |