TN HB1463 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies which students are eligible to have information shared with an LEA, chartering authority, or public charter school approved to operate one or more schools in the district; creates a timeframe within which an LEA, chartering authority, or public charter school receiving eligible student information may communicate with eligible students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies which students are eligible to have information shared with an LEA, chartering authority, or public charter school approved to operate one or more schools in the district; creates a timeframe within which an LEA, chartering authority, or public charter school receiving eligible student information may communicate with eligible students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-02-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
2018-01-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
2018-01-23HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2018-01-22HouseReassigned to Education Instruction & Programs
2018-01-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-10HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2018-01-10HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2018-01-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-11-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1605 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback