TN HB1440 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from the offense of criminal abortion an abortion that is performed on a patient whose pregnancy is the result of rape or incest if the abortion is performed prior to a certain gestational age; requires the physician performing the abortion to confirm that the patient reported the offense to the appropriate law enforcement agency and submitted to a forensic medical examination prior to the procedure; adds a mandatory minimum sentence of three years incarceration for filing a false report of rape or incest for the purpose of obtaining an abortion. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to abortion.
Sponsors
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0857 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee