TN SB0857 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts from the offense of criminal abortion an abortion that is performed on a patient whose pregnancy is the result of rape or incest if the abortion is performed prior to a certain gestational age; requires the physician performing the abortion to confirm that the patient reported the offense to the appropriate law enforcement agency and submitted to a forensic medical examination prior to the procedure; adds a mandatory minimum sentence of three years incarceration for filing a false report of rape or incest for the purpose of obtaining an abortion. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to abortion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1440 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-23 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback