TN HB1438 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-24)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-24)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "National Guard Force Protection Act of 2016". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 58.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "National Guard Force Protection Act of 2016". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 58.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 747 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2016 | |
2016-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0513) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0836) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed H. as amended, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0646) |
2016-03-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0563) |
2016-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-12-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1553 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 747