TN HB1435 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the Tennessee public charter school commission as an appellate charter school authorizer; transfers the commission's authority to authorize charter schools on appeal and to serve as the local education agency for each charter school it authorizes to the state board of education; terminates the commission on July 1, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 49, relative to charter schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1519 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1435&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB1435.pdf |