TN HB1435 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 15 days to 10 business days, the time in which failure to petition for an order of condemnation of an adulterated food, drug, device, or cosmetic causes the tag affixed to such articles signifying they are suspected of being adulterated to be removed. - Amends TCA Title 53; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, reduces, from 15 days to 10 business days, the time in which failure to petition for an order of condemnation of an adulterated food, drug, device, or cosmetic causes the tag affixed to such articles signifying they are suspected of being adulterated to be removed. - Amends TCA Title 53; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0965 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee