TN HB1412 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a filing deadline, of six months from the date that medical services are provided, for claims against the state relative to the payment of expenses for the medical care of prisoners; establishes a filing deadline, of six months from the date of entry of judgment of conviction, for claims against the state relative to the payment of costs incurred in the prosecution and safekeeping of criminal defendants. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 25, Part 1 and Section 41-4-115.
Title
As enacted, establishes a filing deadline, of six months from the date that medical services are provided, for claims against the state relative to the payment of expenses for the medical care of prisoners; establishes a filing deadline, of six months from the date of entry of judgment of conviction, for claims against the state relative to the payment of costs incurred in the prosecution and safekeeping of criminal defendants. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 25, Part 1 and Section 41-4-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582 |
2014-03-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/29/2014 |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1616 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 582