TN HB1389 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires state board of education to notify local school systems of specific prerequisite requirements and the courses of study for which the prerequisites apply at least one year prior to the effective date of any prerequisite courses for vocational technical education. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires state board of education to notify local school systems of specific prerequisite requirements and the courses of study for which the prerequisites apply at least one year prior to the effective date of any prerequisite courses for vocational technical education. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1694 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1389&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1389.pdf |