TN HB1384 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, repeals private act that created the office of county zoning administrator, thus enabling the county to establish the position of county building commissioner pursuant to general law. - Repeals l Chapter 52 of the Private Acts of 1989.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, repeals private act that created the office of county zoning administrator, thus enabling the county to establish the position of county building commissioner pursuant to general law. - Repeals l Chapter 52 of the Private Acts of 1989.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Pr. Ch. 16 | |
2015-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1408 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16