TN SB1408 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, repeals private act that created the office of county zoning administrator, thus enabling the county to establish the position of county building commissioner pursuant to general law. - Repeals l Chapter 52 of the Private Acts of 1989.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, repeals private act that created the office of county zoning administrator, thus enabling the county to establish the position of county building commissioner pursuant to general law. - Repeals l Chapter 52 of the Private Acts of 1989.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16 | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar 2 calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1384 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pr. Ch. 16