TN HB1383 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, from May 25, 2021, to July 1, 2023, law enforcement officers who have been retired for at least nine months from TCRS from any superseded system administered by the state, or from any local retirement fund to accept employment as a law enforcement officer without loss or suspension of retirement benefits if certain conditions met. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7; Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 7; Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37, relative to retirement for certain law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1185 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021