TN HB1379 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1061
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1061
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Eligibility Verification for Entitlements Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Eligibility Verification for Entitlements Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1061 | |
2012-05-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2011-05-18 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to last calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1325 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1061