TN HB1375 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state board of education, in consultation with the department of education, to review current policies, rules and regulations pertaining to transitional licensure options and make recommendations relative to certain items. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires the state board of education, in consultation with the department of education, to review current policies, rules and regulations pertaining to transitional licensure options and make recommendations relative to certain items. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 380 | |
2011-05-21 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0688 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 380