TN HB1373 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state to reimburse a local government that provides health insurance benefits for first responders in an amount equal to that portion of health insurance premiums or expenses for COBRA coverage for benefits for which the local government is responsible. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 27, relative to health insurance benefits for families of first responders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/12/2021 | |
2021-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 424 | |
2021-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0284) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0317) |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1409 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 424