TN HB1368 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 419
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 419
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires facilities or physician offices where more than 50 abortions are performed in a calendar year to be licensed as ambulatory surgical treatment centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
As enacted, requires facilities or physician offices where more than 50 abortions are performed in a calendar year to be licensed as ambulatory surgical treatment centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Barry Doss [R] | Rep. Leigh Wilburn [R] |
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] |
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. John Holsclaw [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] |
Rep. Rick Womick [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Steve McManus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 419 | |
2015-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1280 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 419
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1368&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1368.pdf |