TN HB1359 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allocates state sales and use tax revenues from the construction of a uranium processing facility to an eligible industrial development corporation that submits a completed application to the commissioner of finance and administration together with an application fee in an amount established by the department; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allocates state sales and use tax revenues from the construction of a uranium processing facility to an eligible industrial development corporation that submits a completed application to the commissioner of finance and administration together with an application fee in an amount established by the department; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-22HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/23/2019
2019-04-17HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-03-18HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2019
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for Review-- Finance, Ways, & Means
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1351 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback