TN SB1351 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allocates state sales and use tax revenues from the construction of a uranium processing facility to an eligible industrial development corporation that submits a completed application to the commissioner of finance and administration together with an application fee in an amount established by the department; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, allocates state sales and use tax revenues from the construction of a uranium processing facility to an eligible industrial development corporation that submits a completed application to the commissioner of finance and administration together with an application fee in an amount established by the department; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1359 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee