TN HB1343 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain counties to act upon request for voter registration lists within seven business days instead of seven days; allows reasons for rejection or modification of the request to be sent via electronic mail or facsimile transmission. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5 and Title 6.
Title
As introduced, requires certain counties to act upon request for voter registration lists within seven business days instead of seven days; allows reasons for rejection or modification of the request to be sent via electronic mail or facsimile transmission. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5 and Title 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1401 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee