TN HB1339 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits the circumstances under which a court may permit remote testimony by an expert in the scientific detection of crime (a "forensic analyst") in a criminal proceeding to certain cases; enacts other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 24; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 24; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55, relative to witness testimony.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 501 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1231 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021