TN HB1309 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 323
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 323
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows articles of incorporation of cooperative marketing associations to be amended under certain procedures to allow for a conversion to a general nonprofit corporation. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 16.
Title
As enacted, allows articles of incorporation of cooperative marketing associations to be amended under certain procedures to allow for a conversion to a general nonprofit corporation. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 323 | |
2015-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0852 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 323