TN HB1306 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that if an entity requires on-site payment from a consumer for the parking of a motor vehicle on the entity's property, and the entity only accepts payment by use of a quick response (QR) code or a credit or debit card machine, then, in the event the QR code or the credit or debit card machine fails to operate correctly to process the payment transaction, the entity must either accept payment by cash, check, or credit or debit card or allow the consumer to leave the property without providing payment at the time. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 47 and Title 48, relative to services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 323 | |
2023-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-10 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 93, Nays 2 PNV 0 HB1306 |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0414) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0288) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-02-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 13, PNV 3 |
2023-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0017) |
2023-02-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0661 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 323