TN HB1278 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes counties with a population greater than 180,000, and the cities within such counties, to regulate smoking and the use of vapor products; prohibits the use of vapor products in certain places. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 39, relative to smoking.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021