TN HB1262 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes an expired rulemaking deadline for the board for licensing health care facilities to promulgate rules related to disposal of controlled substances and other prescription drugs. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 53; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 53; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/25/2022 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1444 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee