TN HB1257 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that appointments to the offices of senior judge, chancellor, circuit court judge, criminal court judge, or judge of any other trial court of record, district attorney general, and district public defender be confirmed by general assembly before appointees take office. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 38, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that appointments to the offices of senior judge, chancellor, circuit court judge, criminal court judge, or judge of any other trial court of record, district attorney general, and district public defender be confirmed by general assembly before appointees take office. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 38, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-05HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1408 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback