TN SB1408 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that appointments to the offices of senior judge, chancellor, circuit court judge, criminal court judge, or judge of any other trial court of record, district attorney general, and district public defender be confirmed by general assembly before appointees take office. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 38, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that appointments to the offices of senior judge, chancellor, circuit court judge, criminal court judge, or judge of any other trial court of record, district attorney general, and district public defender be confirmed by general assembly before appointees take office. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 38, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1257 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Action def. in Judiciary to First Calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback