TN HB1233 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives, instead of the commerce committee of the house of representatives, shall annually review the Access Tennessee Act of 2006, and make recommendations to the governor and the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives, instead of the commerce committee of the house of representatives, shall annually review the Access Tennessee Act of 2006, and make recommendations to the governor and the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0757 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1233&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1233.pdf |