TN HB1228 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, in any county that otherwise lacks a qualified dentist in the county who participates in the TennCare dental program, requires the bureau of TennCare to include within its provider network for that county the services of any qualified dentist who applies to participate in the provider network. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, in any county that otherwise lacks a qualified dentist in the county who participates in the TennCare dental program, requires the bureau of TennCare to include within its provider network for that county the services of any qualified dentist who applies to participate in the provider network. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Insurance and Banking Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-01-21 | House | Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to last calendar |
2014-01-15 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 1/21/2014 |
2013-04-02 | House | Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to first calendar of 2014 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1314 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Failed In S. C&L Comm. Ayes 3, Nays 3 PNV 3