TN HB1224 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that property cannot be seized and forfeited on an interstate highway unless and until the person from whom it is seized is convicted of a criminal offense making the property subject to forfeiture. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, provides that property cannot be seized and forfeited on an interstate highway unless and until the person from whom it is seized is convicted of a criminal offense making the property subject to forfeiture. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Dennis [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1335 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1224&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1224.pdf |