TN HB1219 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Stop Guilt by Accusation Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 24; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 24; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the Stop Guilt by Accusation Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/13/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1297 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback