TN HB1208 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits certain victims of crimes to terminate residential leases without penalty upon providing notice and particular documentation to the landlord. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 40 and Title 66, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, permits certain victims of crimes to terminate residential leases without penalty upon providing notice and particular documentation to the landlord. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 40 and Title 66, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0866 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1208&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1208.pdf |