TN HB1207 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that disabled parents receive certain credit toward child support obligations, no more than 4 percent of a parent's social security disability insurance payments can be withheld for arrearages, and becoming disabled is a substantial change in circumstance. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As introduced, provides that disabled parents receive certain credit toward child support obligations, no more than 4 percent of a parent's social security disability insurance payments can be withheld for arrearages, and becoming disabled is a substantial change in circumstance. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c Family Justice of C&FA | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Children & Family Affairs--Government Operations for review | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1111 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1207&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1207.pdf |