TN HB1202 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that semester hours earned in ROTC courses by ROTC students do not count toward the semester hour limitation for receipt of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship; excludes grades received in ROTC courses from the calculation of an ROTC student's grade point average for Tennessee HOPE scholarship purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, specifies that semester hours earned in ROTC courses by ROTC students do not count toward the semester hour limitation for receipt of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship; excludes grades received in ROTC courses from the calculation of an ROTC student's grade point average for Tennessee HOPE scholarship purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0366 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1202&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1202.pdf |