TN HB1202 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that a federal employee who is not designated as a Tennessee peace officer may not make an arrest or conduct a search and seizure in this state without the written permission of the sheriff of the county in which the arrest, search and seizure will take place except under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, provides that a federal employee who is not designated as a Tennessee peace officer may not make an arrest or conduct a search and seizure in this state without the written permission of the sheriff of the county in which the arrest, search and seizure will take place except under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1305 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1202&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1202.pdf |