TN HB1191 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the amount of mileage reimbursement that the legislative body of any county or the legislative body of the metropolitan government of any county may vote to pay jurors from 10 cents to 12 cents. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Title
As introduced, increases the amount of mileage reimbursement that the legislative body of any county or the legislative body of the metropolitan government of any county may vote to pay jurors from 10 cents to 12 cents. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1640 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1191&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1191.pdf |