TN HB1182 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 1/1/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 1/1/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of humans services to initiate investigation of reports of elder abuse or neglect within 24 hours instead of as soon as practical. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of humans services to initiate investigation of reports of elder abuse or neglect within 24 hours instead of as soon as practical. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 1/1/2014 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2013-02-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1113 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1182&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1182.pdf |