TN HB1169 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-22)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-22)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Senator Douglas Henry Tennessee History Act". - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Senator Douglas Henry Tennessee History Act". - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Pub. Ch. 482 | |
2017-06-14 | Effective date(s) 06/06/2017 | |
2017-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0357) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0537) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0642) |
2017-05-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0393) |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-05-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-05-08 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-04-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0864 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 482